ARNOLD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 528191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the education of persons under 25 years of age who have parent or parents resident in the area of the ancient parish of Arnold Nottinghamshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £19,565
Total expenditure: £26,414

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan James Wilson Langton BEM BA Chair
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ARNOLD
Received: On time
Peter Spencer Trustee 17 October 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ARNOLD
Received: On time
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
Kathryn Mary Lake Trustee 17 October 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESTIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, ARNOLD
Received: On time
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BOLTON Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record
Marjorie Irene Paling Trustee 02 November 2020
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
Rev Phillip Williams Trustee 01 July 2019
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
ROBERT PEARSON Trustee 24 February 2014
None on record
GRAHAM ROGER BENNETT Trustee
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S DAYBROOK
Recently registered
STELLA MARIA LANE Trustee
ARNOLD RELIEF IN NEED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £15.33k £23.74k £18.34k £19.10k £19.57k
Total expenditure £14.38k £19.56k £28.36k £15.76k £26.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 28 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
73 ARNOT HILL ROAD
ARNOLD
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 6LN
Phone:
01159206656
Website:

No information available