DIANA EYRE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides money grants for educational purposes to persons under the age of 25 years, who live in the parish of Rampton and Woodbeck, Nottinghamshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 02 August 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Charles Goodman | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Theresa Mary Hauton | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Ogle | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANICE WILKINSON | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SLATTERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.17k | £8.72k | £8.48k | £8.45k | £9.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.45k | £8.45k | £10.21k | £8.36k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13TH MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF RAMPTON AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING - (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIP, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER ( INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL ) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES; (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION ( INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS ), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (B) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, RAMPTON, INSTRUCTION IN THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL OR OTHERWISE; (C) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR THE RAMPTON PRIMARY SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AFTER CONSULTATION WITH THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TRUSTEES OF D.E.E.F.
C/o ROCK COTTAGE
MANOR GROUNDS
RAMPTON
NOTTINGHANSHIRE
DN22 0JU
- Phone:
- 07826818439
- Email:
- trustees4deef@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window