THE STEWART GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of education. Particularly close connection with Wellow House School, Wellow, Newark Notts.Providing bursaries to that School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 May 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ali Khan | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Robin Stattersfield | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Paul Buss | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2024 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2024 | 711 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 February 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1971
Charitable objects
1. ANNUAL INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH WELLOW HOUSE SCHOOL, WELLOW, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE OR 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS (WHETHER OR NOT CONNECTED WITH THE SCHOOL) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN LIKE MANNER DETERMINE. PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL BEFORE EXERCISING THEIR DISCRETION CONSIDER IN THE FIRST PLACE THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE SCHOOL (BUT WITHOUT IMPOSING ON THE TRUSTEES ANY OBLIGATIONS AS TO THE MANNER IN WHICH THEY SHALL EXERCISE SUCH DISCRETION.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alpha Schools Ltd
1 Cliveden Office Village
Lancaster Road,
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP12 3YZ
- Phone:
- 01494 535857
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window