Governing document NOTTINGHAM HIGH SCHOOL
Charity number: 528236
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10TH JUNE 1919 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 5TH NOVEMBER 1921 6TH NOVEMBER 1928 , 3RD JULY 1975 AND SCHEME OF 25 OCTOBER 1996.
Charitable objects
A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GENERAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.