HAWKYARDS AND WHITEHEADS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants for educational purposes to individual children living and going to school in Saddleworth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oldham
Governance
- 06 January 1964: Standard registration
- HAWKYARD TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS A MCINNES | Chair |
|
||||||
Paul Gordon Fryer | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Taylor Brown | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR BRIAN LORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS E ROOKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392 | £375 | £84 | £86 | £189 | |
|
Total expenditure | £282 | £563 | £200 | £150 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4 AUGUST 1939
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION OR THE AWARD OF MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES; B) ATTENDING TO THE HEALTH AND PHYSICAL CONDITION OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF SADDLEWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSEWOOD
ROSE HILL
DELPH
OLDHAM
OL3 5ED
- Phone:
- 01457 871335
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window