Trustees NEWARK PREPARATORY SCHOOL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 528261
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard South Chair 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr Jane Mumby Trustee 26 June 2019
None on record
Jordan Dennis Trustee 08 January 2019
None on record
Sarah Cameron Trustee 30 June 2014
None on record
MR WILL BICKNELL Trustee 31 January 2013
None on record
MR WILL STAUNTON Trustee 30 January 2013
None on record