THE KNITTING INDUSTRIES TRAINING AND RESEARCH FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a fund for training and research to promote best practice in the hosiery and knitwear industry. And to support individuals in vocational training appropriate to the industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 12 August 1963: Standard registration
- 08 March 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 March 2017: Funds transferred to 292630 THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF FRAMEWORK KNITTERS EDUCA...
- THE HOSIERY KNITWEAR AND WARP KNITTING INDUSTRIES SCHOLARSHIP FUND IN CONNECTION WITH NOTTINGHAM TRENT UNIVERSITY. (Previous name)
- THE HOSIERY KNITWEAR AND WARP KNITTING INDUSTRIES SCHOLARSHIP IN CONNECTION WITH NOTTINGHAM AND DISTRICT TECHNICAL COLLEGE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £792 | £839 | £1.39k | £823 | £826 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54k | £4.50k | £5.50k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 06 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 13 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 03 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 06 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 DECEMBER 1960 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A FUND FOR TRAINING AND RESEARCH TO PROMOTE BEST PRACTICE IN THE HOSIERY KNITWEAR AND WARP KNITTING INDUSTRY. TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS IN THE WIDEST ASPECTS OF VOCATIONAL TRAINING APPROPRIATE TO THE SAID INDUSTRY AND TO USE THE FUND AS A MECHANISM FOR ATTRACTING FUNDING TO SUPPORT THE AFOREMENTIONED AIMS AND OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window