THE RATCLIFFIAN ASSOCIATION AND CUNNINGHAM FUND

Charity Number: 528288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1) Promoting Education (including religous, social & physical training) of pupils attending Ratcliffe College. 2) By awarding Bursaries. 3) In promoting education of pupils as aforesaid the trustees shall give preference to the sons & daughters of former pupils of Ratcliffe College and for the benefit of children of poor Irish parents

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £35,049
Total expenditure: £46,003

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 1967: Standard registration
  • 05 December 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RATCLIFFIAN ASSOCIATION AND CUNNINGHAM TRUST (Working name)
  • THE RATCLIFFIAN ASSOCIATION AND CUNNINGHAM SCHOLARSHIP (Previous name)
  • TRUST PROPERTY (2) ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH RATCLIFFE COLLEGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aisling Mitchell Trustee 03 March 2024
None on record
Samantha Spillane Trustee 17 November 2019
None on record
Richard Armitage Trustee 17 November 2019
None on record
Jonathan Reddin Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
James Anthony George Crossley Trustee 15 November 2015
None on record
Alain Francois Regis Gavin Trustee 22 November 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.56k £21.73k £21.31k £29.52k £35.05k
Total expenditure £15.58k £127.95k £99.79k £46.87k £46.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF HIGH COURT CHANCERY 5 MARCH 1943
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EITHER BY MEANS OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR SCHOLARSHIPS OR BY OTHER PAYMENTS THE EDUCATION OR TRAINING OF CHILDREN OF POOR IRISH PARENTS AT EITHER "GRACE DIEU" SCHOOL OR RATCLIFFE COLLEGE OR ANY OTHER UNIVERSITY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR EIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 01 September 1967 : Standard registration
  • 05 December 2000 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
58 Beverley Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 6PJ
Phone:
01926 429122
Website:

No information available