Accounts and annual returns THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF WILLOUGHBY HALL IN THE UNIVERSITY OF NOTTINGHAM TRAVEL BURSARY

Charity number: 528291
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 01 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required