THE SOCIAL POLICY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education and learning and in particular to advance teaching, research and disseminationof knowledge in the field of social policy and administration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 November 1968: Standard registration
- SOCIAL ADMINISTRATION ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Ann Marie Gray | Chair | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin Clark | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Dianne-Dominique Theakstone | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Bailey | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hayley Bennett | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alessio D'Angelo | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Chapman | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee James Gregory | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Folasade Ajose | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Lisle Finch | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Patrick Rolfe | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carolyn Jane Snell | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Scott Tripney | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Robertson | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gideon James Calder | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vikki Borland nee McCall | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Enrico Reuter | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chui Man Chau | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Markus Johannes Ketola | Trustee | 07 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Antonios roumpakis | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.18k | £39.32k | £81.68k | £106.40k | £164.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.97k | £31.50k | £36.02k | £69.55k | £163.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 January 2023 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JULY 1968 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 1988 as amended on 17 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEARNING AND IN PARTICULAR TO ADVANCE TEACHING RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELD OF SOCIAL POLICY AND ADMINISTRATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Social Policy Association
10 Queens Street Place
London
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 020 7551 7777
- Email:
- admin@social-policy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window