Financial history THE EDWARD ROGERS TRUST

Charity number: 528358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.56k £6.84k £6.38k £6.70k £7.21k
Total expenditure £2.94k £75 £3.25k £3.86k £9.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A