RADBROOK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the education of students at Shrewsbury Colleges Group who are in need of financial assistance by giving them grants and the provision for Shrewsbury Colleges Group of special benefits of any kind not normally provided by the local education authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 18 March 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Young Mr | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
James Staniforth | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Janet Mary Leake | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Francis Willmot | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rex Philip Sartain | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Monica Pemberton | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
IAIN GILMOUR | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Claire Nichola Brentnall | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN ABRAM MBE TD | Trustee | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
MR A D CROSS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.13k | £96.27k | £101.42k | £119.71k | £133.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.29k | £91.93k | £236.75k | £18.58k | £143.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 MARCH 1987 AND VARIED BY SCHEME OF 17 DECEMBER 1996 as amended on 01 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR THE SHREWSBURY COLLEGE OF ARTS AND TECHNOLOGY SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. 2) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE STUDENTS AT THE SAID COLLEGE AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, WITH A PREFERENCE AMONGST SUCH PERSONS FOR THOSE WHO HAVE FOR THE THREE YEARS IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THEIR ADMISSION TO THE SAID COLLEGE HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church View
Castle Chambers
St. Marys Place
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1DX
- Phone:
- 01743360470
- Email:
- chris.yaxley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window