THE CARESWELL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial assistance for the further education of students in Shropshire and the parish of Bobbington and Staffordshire who are under the age of 25 and in need of financial assistance and who are pupils or former pupils of Shrewsbury School, Bridgnorth Endowed School, Secondary Schools for the Donnington area, Adams Grammar School, Idsall School and Thomas Adams School Wem
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 06 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Dawn Case | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|||||||
Toby Peter Percival | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Liam Allen | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|||||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM CONWAY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DEREK PEDEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.33k | £11.52k | £13.04k | £14.51k | £26.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.15k | £20.08k | £13.45k | £10.65k | £13.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 12 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE FURTHER EDUCATION OF BOYS RESIDENT IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND THE PARISH OF BOBBINGTON, IN THE COUNTY OF STAFFORDSHIRE WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 AND IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PUPILS OR FORMER PULIPS OF ONE OF THE SCHOOLS HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO: FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 18 1NA)-(F) AND 2.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE, THE PARISH OF BOBBINGTON IN STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Maple House
Sitka Drive
Shrewsbury Business Park
Shrewsbury
Shropshire
SY2 6LG
- Phone:
- 07815 642666
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window