BEDSTONE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the educational aspirations of individuals and organisations through donations, sponsorship and bursaries; Where appropriate, the Trust may make donations in support of capital projects at educational establishments to maximise the beneficial effect of Trust benevolence. The Trust will aim to focus its support within Shropshire and adjoining counties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Herefordshire
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Worcestershire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 09 October 1962: Standard registration
- BEDSTONE COLLEGE (Working name)
- BEDSTONE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PETER SPENCER FYNES | Chair | 17 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Phillips | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Phillips | Trustee | 07 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE SANDRA THOMAS | Trustee | 27 November 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.18k | £863 | £3.60k | £4.59k | £4.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.82k | £76.15k | £90.88k | £92.79k | £87.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 7 MAY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 APRIL 1981 AND 20 MARCH 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF BOYS AND GIRLS AT SECONDARY SCHOOL LEVEL BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES TO THOSE NOT NORMALLY ABLE TO ACCESS SUCH OPPORTUNITIES DUE TO FAMILY FINANCIAL LIMITATIONS OR DISADVANTAGE.?
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREMYNFA
CARREGHOFA
LLANYMYNECH
SY22 6LA
- Phone:
- 01691839471
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window