DILHORNE ENDOWED SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please see Area of Operation entry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 01 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Thurstan | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kay Hulse | Trustee | 16 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ROGER SUCH | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER LOWELL DALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL DANIEL COBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.21k | £6.73k | £1.04k | £92 | £7.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.92k | £2.33k | £500 | £980 | £9.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2024 | 666 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2021 | 221 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27/11/1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/11/1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/05/2015
Charitable objects
INCOME IN ASSISTING THE GOVERNORS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SCHOOL TO DISCHARGE THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1988 WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL.IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION AS AFORESAID THE GOVERNORS SHALL APPLY THE SAME IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:(A) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING FOR THE SCHOOL SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.(B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF DILHORNE AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DILHORNE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dicksons Solicitors Ltd
30-36 Cheapside
Hanley
Stoke on Trent
ST1 1HQ
- Phone:
- 01782262424
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window