KINVER EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 528584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity sets out to help young people who are in need of financial assistance and who reside in the parish of Kinver with education and training grants.It also provides financial grants for the local secondary school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £10,253
Total expenditure: £10,047

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Tart Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Andrew Michael Gary Calloway Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
paul wooddisse Trustee 26 April 2024
None on record
Sylvia Sidaway Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Nicola Clifton Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Geoffrey Sisley Trustee 29 May 2019
None on record
VICTORIA WILSON Trustee 28 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.65k £9.70k £8.88k £9.77k £10.25k
Total expenditure £9.05k £10.49k £8.65k £8.70k £10.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Chantry Road
Stourton
STOURBRIDGE
West Midlands
DY7 6SA
Phone:
01384872656
Website:

No information available