TOWN BRANCH (CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to local primary schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 October 1963: Standard registration
- EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Margaret Wells | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||||
Terence Smith | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
James Tickle | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Steve Jackson | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Stuart John Anderson | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
Conor Wileman | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
JAMES MUIR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £989 | £1.00k | £984 | £985 | £965 | |
|
Total expenditure | £276 | £276 | £276 | £276 | £288 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5 MAY 1911 AND 16 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF SPECIAL FACILITIES FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL CHILDREN. PAYMENT FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE BURTON ENDOWED SCHOOLS. SCHOLARSHIPS TENABLE AT THE ENDOWED SCHOOL, AND EXHIBITIONS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION FOR PUPILS OF THE SCHOOLS. PROMOTION OF TECHNICAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BURTON UPON TRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 Field Lane
Outwoods
Burton-on-Trent
Staffordshire
DE13 0NJ
- Phone:
- 07831637678
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window