RUGELEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 10 September 1963: Standard registration
- 18 December 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RUGELEY SCHOOL PRIZES FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1930 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 12T DECEMBER 1966, AS AMENDED ON 8 OCTOBER 2001 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT.
Charitable objects
1) A SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS 2) THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY 3) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OUTFITS CLOTHING TOOLS INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION TRADE OR CALLING AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE STUDENTS TO TRAVEL TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS. BENEFICIARIES TO BE YOUNG PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF TWENTY FIVE YEARS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN AT ANY TIME IN ATTENDENCE AT THE SCHOOL.THE ALEX PAYNE CONVERSATION FRENCH PRIZE FOUNDED BY A TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1956. MRS LUCY COTTRELL'S FOUNDED BY THE WILL OF MRS LUCY COTTRELL WHO DIED ON 19TH JOF MRS LUCY COTTRELL WHO DIED ON 19TH JANUARY 1940.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.