Governing document ABS 2018 LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 NOV 1941 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUN 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 MAR 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 AUG 2017 AS AMENDED ON 31 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE THOUGHT FIT, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS ABROAD GENERAL EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE GENERALLY WITH THE PRINCIPLES, TRADITIONS AND AIMS DEVELOPED AT ABBOTSHOLME SCHOOL SINCE ITS FOUNDATION IN 1889 BY THE LATE DR.CECIL REDDIE. 2. TO ACQUIRE AND TAKE OVER AND CARRY ON THE SCHOOL AND TO PROVIDE FOR THE BOARD, RESIDENCE AND ACCOMMODATION OF ALL OR ANY OF THE PUPILS AND TEACHING AND OTHER STAFF FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SCHOOL. 3. TO AWARD ENTRANCE AND OTHER SCHOLARSHIPS AND BURSARIES AT THE SCHOOL AND TO PROVIDE EXHIBITIONS OR SCHOLARSHIPS FOR HIGHER EDUCATION OR PROFESSIONAL OR BUSINESS TRAINING FOR THE BENEFIT OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL, 4. TO CARRY ON ANY OTHER SCHOLASTIC OR EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES CAPABLE OF BEING CONVENIENTLY CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH ANY OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS, AND CALCULATED DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY TO BENEFIT THE ASSOCIATION OR THE SCHOOL OR THE CAUSE OF EDUCATION GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.