DR HULME'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 12 November 1963: Standard registration
- 03 May 2002: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22ND APRIL 1913 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUNE 1998 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND 28 OCTOBER 1998 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
DISCRETIONARY PAYMENTS TO ENABLE BOYS AND GIRLS TO ATTEND ANY DAY OR EVENING COURSES OF INSTRUCTION JUNIOR OR SENIOR EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY INSTITUTION OF TECHNICAL, PROFESSIONAL, OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT CHAPELRY OF NEWCHAPEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.