ROBERT SCHOLEFIELD MILNER BEQUEST FOR GENERAL EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for needy families to assist pupils' attendance at school visits, and other approved secular educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 October 1963: Standard registration
- MILNER BEQUEST (Working name)
- THE MILNER BEQUEST (Working name)
- ROBERT SCHOLEFIELD MILNER FOR GENERAL EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Gledhill | Chair | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adele Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Coleman | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Kate Nicholls | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Gareth Graham | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Stuart Warrington | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE QUINN | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DWYER | Trustee | 26 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MS VICKI WOOLACROFT | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN LOVATT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £3.92k | £3.97k | £3.42k | £183 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £0 | £675 | £835 | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1976 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
GENERAL EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 21 AND 22 OF SCHEME)
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEEK
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 ADAMS GROVE
LEEK
ST13 8NX
- Phone:
- 01538372385
- Email:
- aknobbs@milnertrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window