THE REGINALD MITCHELL LECTURE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising lectures on engineering topics
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 03 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Keith Knapper | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Redmond | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WATKIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187 | £126 | £117 | £134 | £145 | |
|
Total expenditure | £187 | £0 | £117 | £134 | £145 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2025 | 348 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST MAY 1958
Charitable objects
AWARD OF A GOLD MEDAL TO DISTINGUISHED ENGINEER AND/OR SCIENTIST IN ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HIS WORK AS SUCH AND AS A MEMORIAL TO REGINALD JOHN MITCHELL. ORGANISATION OF AN ANNUAL LECTURE TO THE MEMBERS OF THE STOKE-ON-TRENT ASSOCIATION OF ENGINEERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 ROSSALL AVENUE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 3JJ
- Phone:
- 01782614316
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
no.website
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window