Financial history CHAMBERS ENDOWMENT FUND(IN CONNECTION WITH RADWAY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL)

Charity number: 528679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £288 £750 £0 £500 £250
Total expenditure £338 £85 £750 £0 £346
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A