THE JOHN LUCY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust manages its property which is situated in the parish of Hampton Lucy. From the net proceeds of income, the trust makes grants for the benefit of Hampton Lucy C of E Primary School, Hampton Lucy Parish Church and to promote the education of persons under the age of 25 who are, or whose parents are resident in the parish of Hampton Lucy, and who are in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 18 October 1963: Standard registration
- JOHN LUCY TRUST (Working name)
- LUCY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON JANE HARRISON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Linda Karen MacDermott | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tanya Potter | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Stafford Northcote-Green | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Eddie Hoare | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.56k | £42.68k | £118.00k | £47.93k | £44.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.52k | £35.05k | £88.66k | £47.67k | £39.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.61k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5TH DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
PROVIDING HAMPTON LUCY JUNIOR SCHOOL OR OTHER SCHOOL IN THE AOB SPECIAL BENEFIT NOT PROVIDED BY THE LEA IN PROMOTING EDUCATION ALSO TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE OR PARENTS ARE RESIDENTS IN THE AOB , UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH
Area of benefit
HAMPTON LUCY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jasmine Cottage
Church Street
Hampton Lucy
WARWICK
CV35 8BE
- Phone:
- 01789 840375
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window