EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF WILLIAM SMALLWOOD

Charity number: 528712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EDUCATION GRANTS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £187
Total expenditure: £491

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALCESTER UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Constable Trustee 04 November 2024
ALCESTER WAR MEMORIAL TOWN HALL CIO
Received: On time
CHURCH STREET PROPERTY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
Tracy Margaret Parkes Trustee 20 November 2023
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WENDY MILLS Trustee 23 January 2022
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
KAY BLAKE Trustee 01 November 2021
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev KATIE CROSS Trustee 01 November 2021
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
MOOR FIELDS CHARITY
Received: On time
MICHAEL BOWE Trustee 27 July 2021
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
KATHRYN CARGILL Trustee 24 July 2017
ALCESTER UNITED POORS CHARITY
Received: On time
ALCESTER UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
NEWPORT'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION CIO
Recently registered
MR ANDY MILLS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £174 £178 £181 £186 £187
Total expenditure £25 £185 £25 £365 £491
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 January 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 HENLEY STREET
ALCESTER
WARWICKSHIRE
B49 5QY
Phone:
01789763723
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available