Financial history ASHORNE HILL MANAGEMENT COLLEGE

Charity number: 528784
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.40m £1.52m £2.80m £5.18m £6.90m
Total expenditure £4.65m £2.90m £3.38m £4.99m £6.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.27k £808.74k £128.03k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £260.22k £32.03k £125.21k £129.17k £203.60k
Income - Charitable activities £4.11m £674.95k £2.54m £5.05m £6.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.50k £1.24k £180 £8.36k £37.34k
Income - Other £26.51k £815.11k £128.03k £83 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.40m £2.67m £3.04m £4.64m £6.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £56.17k £49.45k £50.00k £63.44k £49.92k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £15.17k £12.00k £12.00k £14.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £189.00k £189.00k £293.03k £288.00k £347.63k