WYNN'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides bibles to children moving from junior to senior school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £3,072
Total expenditure: £2,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PENN WYNN FOUNDATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua Blunt Trustee 30 September 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PENN FIELDS, WOLVERHAMPTON
Received: On time
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Rebecca Welton Trustee 14 November 2023
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Val Plant Trustee 07 November 2023
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Russell Martin Stokes Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Rachael Kilmister Trustee 07 May 2019
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time
Andrea Beech Trustee 27 January 2014
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time
JONATHAN ROBERT NORDEN Trustee
THE PENN, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST PHILIP CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.58k £2.32k £2.37k £1.84k £3.07k
Total expenditure £10.79k £0 £0 £2.40k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 20 August 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 August 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 13 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Attwell Park
Merry Hill
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 7NS
Phone:
01902564484
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available