THE MARY BRIDGEMAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational Foundation. Subject to payment of the expenses aforesaid the trustees shall apply the income of the Educational Foundation in advancing the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 years who are resident or who have a parent or parents resident in the area of benefit and who in the opinion of the Trustees are in need of financial assistance.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,706
Total expenditure: £1,808

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Fiona Harrison-Smith Chair 15 November 2023
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Gloria Smith Trustee 06 November 2024
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
George Edward Richards Trustee 15 November 2023
CASTLE BROMWICH HALL AND GARDENS TRUST
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Anthony Teale Trustee 15 November 2023
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SUSAN BATES Trustee 14 May 2022
THE PHILIP BATES TRUST
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CASTLE BROMWICH
Received: On time
Jacqueline Stephanie Ward Trustee 02 November 2019
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
COUNCILLOR PAULINE SYLVIA ALLEN Trustee 16 November 2011
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE EARL OF BRADFORD RICHARD THOMAS ORLANDO BRIDGEMAN Trustee
THE UNITED NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY BRIDGEMAN ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £750 £1.64k £1.84k £1.93k £1.71k
Total expenditure £1.55k £0 £1.73k £2.98k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dame Mary Bridgeman Charity Trust
St Mary & St Margaret Church
Chester Road
Castle Bromwich
BIRMINGHAM
B36 9DE
Phone:
01217471270
Website:

No information available