WHITEHOUSE COMMON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Whitehouse Common Primary School Parents Association raises money for causes that benefit all the children at the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 17 January 1968: Standard registration
- WHITEHOUSE COMMON MIDDLE SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WHITEHOUSE COMMON PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Ann Highton | Chair | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Barber | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rowena Taylor | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.92k | £10.45k | £7.30k | £15.55k | £17.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.71k | £12.24k | £6.84k | £8.73k | £17.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 February 2024 | 249 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2022 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 14 June 2022 | 744 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION DATED 11TH DECEMBER 1967
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND, AS ANCILLARY THERETO: 1. TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PARENTS, STAFF AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2. TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. (PRESENT PROJECT: TO PROVIDE TEACHING SWIMMING POOL).
Area of benefit
SUTTON COLDFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHITEHOUSE COMMON PRIMARY SCHOOL
COTYSMORE ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
WEST MIDLANDS
B75 6BL
- Phone:
- 0121 464 1918
- Email:
- WHCPTA@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window