ROYAL BIRMINGHAM SOCIETY OF ARTISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the public education in the practice of fine arts and other allied arts and crafts through the maintenance of the RBSA Gallery as a venue for the organisation of exhibitions and events. To develop and maintain a permanent collection to support and enhance these activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 02 June 1969: Standard registration
- R B S A (Working name)
- RBSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ed Isaacs | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rob Leckey | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR VIVIAN ASTLING | Trustee | 16 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW KENNETH MACKENZIE MATHESON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.77k | £182.64k | £235.47k | £236.20k | £159.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.70k | £165.14k | £144.91k | £231.88k | £204.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.47k | £26.14k | £29.60k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUN AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JUNE, 1912, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2ND JANURARY, 1969. as amended on 26 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND THE PRACTICE OF ART AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF PAINTING, SCULPTURE CERAMICS AND ARCHITECTURE AND OTHER ALLIED ARTS AND CRAFTS. TO ADVANCE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE PRACTICE OF THE FINE ARTS, MORE ESPECIALLY IN BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
GALLERIES AT 69A NEW STREET, BIRMINGHAM 2.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Brook Street
Birmingham
B3 1SA
- Phone:
- 01212364353
- Email:
- rbsagallery@rbsa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window