Financial history THE MITCHELLS & BUTLERS CHARITABLE TRUSTS

Charity number: 528922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £125.25k £99.98k £94.05k £104.48k £113.26k
Total expenditure £181.93k £84.41k £70.78k £104.30k £94.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A