JOSEPH CHAMBERLAIN SCHOLARSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LETTER DATED 4TH DECEMBER 1876 SCHEME 30TH DECEMBER 1969 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1997
Charitable objects
SCHOLARSHIPS BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES.ASSISTANCE TO ENTER A PROFESSION,TRADE OR CALLING.GENERALLY PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES.(SEE SCHEME FOR FULL DETAILS)
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window