BIRMINGHAM HILLEL HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Student Hostel + Support for University JSoc Social and Educational Events Hosted at Birmingham Hillel House
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Alexander Rowe | Chair | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Georgevic | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARILYN JACOBS | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
HARVEY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD JACOBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.05k | £116.23k | £112.39k | £117.71k | £221.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.23k | £121.28k | £96.90k | £110.83k | £169.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 1960 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL EDUCATIONAL AND RELIGIOUS WELFARE OF STUDENTS OF THE JEWISH FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 EUAN CLOSE
GILLHURST ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B17 8PL
- Phone:
- 07906169983
- Email:
- briandcarol@chezcooper.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window