Foundry Training Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust continues to support training/learning initiatives for the cast metals industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 March 1965: Standard registration
- THE NATIONAL FOUNDRY COLLEGE (Previous name)
- TOR LODGE AND APPLECROSS TRUST (Previous name)
- TOR LODGE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michele Bickerton | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Lindsay | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Melville Birch | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SWIFT | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr PAMELA MURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK BAYLISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF STUART BLACKBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MICHAEL TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.25k | £50.80k | £19.45k | £100.04k | £59.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.94k | £37.69k | £29.68k | £102.65k | £65.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 FEBRUARY 1988 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 13 MARCH 1998. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 MAY 2001 AND 10 JUNE 2002 AND SCHEME OF 15TH AUGUST 2005 as amended on 20 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
RESIDENTIAL HOSTEL FOR FOUNDRY INDUSTRY RELATED STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SANDWELL COLLEGE OF FURTHER AND HIGHER EDUCATION.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 17 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINTON HOUSE
LYONSHALL
KINGTON
HR5 3JP
- Phone:
- 07802420917
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window