Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE SIR ALFRED HERBERT SCHOLARSHIP TRUST
Charity number: 1081690-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 17/03/1983
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/08/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH OR INTENDING TO BE ENGAGED IN THE ENGINEERING, MANUFACTURING, MACHINERY AND MACHINE TOOLS INDUSTRIES
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS OR WARWICKSHIRE
Registration history
- 10 May 1984: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 September 2010: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 October 2013: Re-registered
- 03 July 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 03 July 2019: Funds transferred to 1081690 MTA EDUCATION TRUST
Other names
- THE SIR ALFRED HERBERT TRAVELLING SCHOLARSHIP IN CONNECTION WITH COVENTRY TECHNICAL COLLEGE AND THE LANCASTER COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.