DAVID LEWIS MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 12 September 1963: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- DAVID LEWIS MEMORIAL FUND IN CONNEXION WITH BILSTON GIRLS' HIGH SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 30 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1944
Charitable objects
TO LEND OR MAKE GRANTS TO PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE BILSTON GIRL'S HIGH SCHOOL TO ENABLE THEM TO ENTER UPON AND PURSUE COURSES OF ADVANCED INSTRUCTION AT INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION OR TO UNDERTAKE SOME FORM OF PROFESSIONAL TRAINING FOR WHICH THEY ARE QUALIFIED.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF STAFFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window