Accounts and annual returns SOLIHULL SCHOOL

Charity number: 529056
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 11 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 19 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 17 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 16 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 22 February 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2004 14 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 21 July 2005 21 days late