CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH WAVERLY SCHOOL(BRIAN-HENRY-CLARKE)

Charity number: 529068
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 June 1963: Standard registration
  • 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • CHARITIES ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH WAVERLY GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 10 OCTOBER 1962
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE PRIZES ANNUALLY TO A PUPIL OR PUPILS BOY OR GIRL WITH THE OBJECT OF PROMOTING THE STUDY OF BIOLOGY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 June 1963 : Standard registration
  • 27 August 2009 : Removed