Trustees ERMYSTED'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 529109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE LLOYD Chair 19 October 2017
None on record
Shabnam Ahsan Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Goring Sturman Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Brent Garner Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Jonathan Burton Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Samantha Trelease Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
STUART CLARKSON Trustee 03 October 2019
None on record
DORNIER SWIFFEN Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record
Dr SARAH HUMPHREY Trustee 31 July 2013
None on record