Financial history THE HEATH CHARITY

Charity number: 529163
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.43k £93 £295 £3.91k £8.54k
Total expenditure £13.88k £3.03k £24.28k £48.44k £44.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A