ARCHBISHOP MARGETSON'S SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 529196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides support for children from Drighlington Primary School in the transition to Secondary Education

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £113
Total expenditure: £225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Grimshaw Trustee 23 June 2023
GRACE LIFE CHURCH LTD
Received: On time
Andrew North Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Andrea Richardson Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
ROBERT WILLIAM GETTINGS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £52 £41 £34 £69 £113
Total expenditure £174 £150 £167 £185 £225
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Station Road
Drighlington
BRADFORD
BD11 1JU
Phone:
01132852847
Website:

No information available