Accounts and annual returns THE YORKSHIRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 529285
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 28 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2011 01 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2010 04 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 04 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2009 04 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 04 January 2010 On Time