Financial history THE WHITCLIFFE MOUNT SCHOOL SCHOLARSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 529326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.63k £10.84k £11.01k £11.62k £12.08k
Total expenditure £10.20k £5.28k £14.83k £11.13k £11.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A