MIRFIELD EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to advance, either generally or individually, the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 who are resident, or who have a parent or parents resident, in the area of the former Urban District of Mirfield. The trustees meet in February, May and October each year to consider written applications received by the clerk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kirklees
Governance
- 30 September 1961: Standard registration
- MIRFIELD EDUCATION CHARITY (Working name)
- MIRFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Frances Stevens | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GRAHAM CROSS | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Michael Nind | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SYKES | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR VIVIEN LEES - HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER OLDFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN MARTYN BOLT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD ALAN SPEIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.36k | £56.32k | £56.29k | £63.48k | £66.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.95k | £49.40k | £59.72k | £58.10k | £65.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 FEBRUARY 1977 AND SCHEME OF 23 JANUARY 1978.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT, OR WHO HAVE A PARENT OR PARENTS RESIDENT, IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF MIRFIELD.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF MIRFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Rectory View
Thornhill
DEWSBURY
WF12 0NN
- Phone:
- 01924456780
- Email:
- parkinson922@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window