BATLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education for pupils aged 3-4, serving a wide geographical area around the Batley & Dewsbury region of West Yorkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 27 July 1982: Standard registration
- 14 January 2014: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- BATLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN BLAMIRES | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||
ALISTAIR HARTLEY | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
OLIVER TIPLADY | Trustee | 08 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBIN NATHAN GHOSH | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Duncan Taylor | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR JOHN ANTHONY DOUBLE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.93k | £76.86k | £66.03k | £27.48k | £33.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.15k | £57.03k | £36.76k | £31.62k | £24.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2024 | 493 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 November 2024 | 493 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 August 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 295 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 295 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 March 2022 | 619 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 March 2022 | 619 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 02/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH: (1) THE PROVISION OF A SITE IN BATLEY FOR AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION; AND (2) THE SUPPORT OF THE SCHOOL IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT; AND (3) FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS BY THE AWARD OF PRIZES (OR OTHER SUITABLE REWARD); AND (4) GIVING GRANTS, BURSARIES OR OTHER PAYMENTS OR FORMS OF SUPPORT TO: (A) PUPILS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TO ATTEND THE SCHOOL OR TO TAKE PART IN EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES; AND (B) FORMER PUPILS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO FURTHER OR HIGHER EDUCATION, A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICES OR TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
BATLEY
Linked charities
- 27 July 1982 : Standard registration
- 14 January 2014 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATLEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL
CARLINGHOW HILL
BATLEY
WF17 0AD
- Phone:
- 01924474980
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window