SHEFFIELD GRAMMAR SCHOOL EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Beneficiaries must live within the Sheffield City boundary. There is no age limit for applicants. Grants ave available for general educational purposes and a variety of other activities, including medical electives, field trips, 'gap year' electives, sporting activities and musical training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE MADELEINE FERRETTI MA PGCE | Chair | 03 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Stephen Clive Fowler | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||||
Becky Rose Musonda | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gemma Elisabeth Greenup | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Richard Cutting | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Sarah Catherine Turner | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
ZAHID HAMID | Trustee | 29 September 2014 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR M BATEMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.19k | £163.58k | £191.97k | £195.54k | £179.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227.57k | £146.02k | £183.99k | £236.91k | £282.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29 JUNE 1888 ALTERED BY SCHEMES DATED 14 MARCH 1890, 26 NOVEMBER 1897, 13 MARCH 1905, 26 JULY 1912, 9 JANUARY 1925, 24 JANUARY 1957 AND 17 JANUARY 1979.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL SHEFFIELD. (B) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY MEANS OF EXHIBITIONS OR FINANCIAL HELP TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO PREPARE FOR OR TO ENTER A TRADE, PROFESSION OR CALLING FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE ABOUT TO ATTEND OR ARE ATTENDING, OR HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDED KING EDWARD VII SCHOOL, SHEFFIELD.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WRIGLEYS SOLICITORS LLP
DERWENT HOUSE
150 ARUNDEL GATE
SHEFFIELD
S1 2FN
- Phone:
- 01142675588
- Email:
- sue.greaves@wrigleys.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window