WALES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To consider annual bursaries to recommended students going on to University or further education from the Wales High School, Kiveton Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Rotherham
Governance
- 20 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Whiteman | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC EDWARD BECK | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE CARSWELL | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205 | £0 | £143 | £318 | £324 | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £1.20k | £1.20k | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 March 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1908
Charitable objects
(I) EDUCATION IN PRACTICAL AND TECHNICAL SUBJECTS (II) EXHIBITIONS IN TECHNICAL, PROFESSIONAL AND INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION (III) EVENING SCHOOL FEES.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALES PARISH COUNCIL
133B WALES ROAD
KIVETON PARK
SHEFFIELD
S26 6RB
- Phone:
- 01909515784
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window