THE PENISTONE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the education of people under the age of 25 years within the area of benefit by awarding scholarships, maintenance allowances or grants tenable at school, university, college or institution of higher or further education, assisting with travel and supporting religious instuction in accordance with the tenets of the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Barnsley
- Kirklees
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 26 August 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2012: Re-registered
- NATIONAL SCHOOL (Working name)
- PENISTONE GIRLS' FREE SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD D J HOPKIN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Frances Nixon | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Johnathan Cutts | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Lister | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
MAUREEN FAXON | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|||||||
MAGGIE STUBBS | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT JOHN BARNARD | Trustee | 21 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.40k | £4.54k | £4.50k | £3.00k | £3.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £0 | £10 | £60 | £55 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13/10/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; B) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS) WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE BY ASSISTING THEM WITH TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; C) SUPPORTING RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND BY MEANS OF SUNDAY SCHOOLS OR OTHERWISE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PENISTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
SHREWSBURY ROAD
PENISTONE
SHEFFIELD
S36 6DY
- Phone:
- 01226 370954
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window