PENISTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity gives grants to students of Penistone Grammar School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
Governance
- 24 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neville Shiggins | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Milner | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Asquith | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Lister | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
JOSEPH UNSWORTH | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John O'Hara | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Cutts | Trustee | 23 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
Anne Rusby | Trustee | 01 August 2003 |
|
|
||||
BARNSLEY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.12k | £62.31k | £63.87k | £69.74k | £75.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.04k | £647.17k | £584.94k | £665.19k | £28.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7TH JANUARY, 1957
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY EXHIBITIONS TO PUPILS TENABLE AT ANY INSTITUTE OF SECONDARY OR FURTHER EDUCATION PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO ENTER OR PREPARE FOR A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF PENISTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARNSLEY MBC
FINANCIAL SERVICES
PO BOX 14
LEVEL 3
WESTGATE PLAZA
BARNSLEY
- Phone:
- 01226775630
- Email:
- ARONSMITH@BARNSLEY.GOV.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window