Financial history CLARKE'S OLD SCHOOL FOUNDATION WIGGLESWORTH

Charity number: 529482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.42k £23.15k £24.35k £17.20k £20.63k
Total expenditure £25.11k £23.45k £11.02k £12.45k £15.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.64k N/A N/A